+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/2/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Property Tax
- Read first time
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor