+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor