+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On November 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor