+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 15, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/1/2019
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/3/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor