+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor