+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/14/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor