+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor