+ − Actions (27)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor