+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-author authorized
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor