+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On November 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate