+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Withdrawn from calendar
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor