+ − Actions (71)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor