+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Rereferred to committee
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor