+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/21
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Amended
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/31/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate