+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On May 28, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Rules suspended
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Reported engrossed
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor