+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Received from the Senate
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor