+ − Actions (48)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/09
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor