+ − Actions (44)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate