+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-author authorized
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
- Reported engrossed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate