+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee report distributed
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor