+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Energy Resources
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor