+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate