+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor