+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor