+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/17/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate