+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor