+ − Actions (73)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On June 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate requests conference committee
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Posting rule suspended
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor