+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (82)
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference comm. report again filed
- House recommits to conf. comm.-reported
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- House recommits to conference committee
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate recommits to conference committee
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate refuses to concur
- Read
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate