+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor