+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (86)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate