+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee report distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor