+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (69)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate requests conference committee
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/18/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor