+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate