+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate