+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee report distributed
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/30/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate