+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor