+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/15
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Point of order overruled
- Read 3rd time
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
On May 23, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Recommitted to committee
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Amended
- Record vote
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Placed on intent calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor