+ − Actions (31)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor