+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate