+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/24/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor