+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 22, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor