+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor