+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor