+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/12/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate