+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Technology
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate