+ − Actions (12)
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor