+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Co-author authorized
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/24/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate