+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Point of order sustained
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed to engrossment
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Rereferred to committee
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor