+ − Actions (30)
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to International Relations and Trade
- Read first time
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor