+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor